PA SB1241 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on November 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-25 - Act No. 137
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of April 9, 1929 (P.L.177, No.175), known as The Administrative Code of 1929, in powers and duties of the Department of General Services and its departmental administrative and advisory boards and commissions, providing for report of State facilities owned or leased.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In powers and duties of the Department of General Services and its departmental administrative and advisory boards and commissions, providing for report of State facilities owned or leased.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-11-20 - House - House Floor: SB 1241 PN 1936, FP (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-19 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-30 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-22 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1241 PN 1936, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-21 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Reported as Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-08 - Senate - Senate State Government: Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-11-25HouseAct No. 137
2020-11-25HouseApproved by the Governor
2020-11-20HousePresented to the Governor
2020-11-20HouseSigned in House
2020-11-20HouseSigned in Senate
2020-11-20HouseThird consideration and final passage (202-0)
2020-11-19HouseRe-reported as committed
2020-10-20HouseRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2020-10-20HouseSecond consideration
2020-10-19HouseRemoved from table
2020-09-30HouseLaid on the table
2020-09-30HouseFirst consideration
2020-09-30HouseReported as committed
2020-09-23HouseReferred to STATE GOVERNMENT
2020-09-22HouseIn the House
2020-09-22SenateThird consideration and final passage (49-0)
2020-09-21SenateRe-reported as committed
2020-09-09SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2020-09-09SenateSecond consideration
2020-09-08SenateFirst consideration
2020-09-08SenateReported as amended
2020-07-29SenateCorrective Reprint, Printer's No. 1869
2020-07-27SenateReferred to STATE GOVERNMENT

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=S&type=B&bn=1241
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=1241&pn=1861
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=1241&pn=1869
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=1241&pn=1936
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=41&theDate=09/08/2020&RollCallId=1103
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=09/21/2020&RollCallId=1140
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=640
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=36&theDate=09/30/2020&RollCallId=2544
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=11/19/2020&RollCallId=2652
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1761

Bill Comments

feedback