PA SB1239 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-10-27 - Act No. 189
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-10-27 - Act No. 189
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 75 (Vehicles) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in licensing of drivers, further providing for occupational limited license; in driving after imbibing alcohol or utilizing drugs, further providing for grading and for prior offenses; and, in enforcement, further providing for reports by courts.
Title
In licensing of drivers, further providing for occupational limited license; in driving after imbibing alcohol or utilizing drugs, further providing for grading and for prior offenses; and, in enforcement, further providing for reports by courts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-10-16 - Senate - Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-04 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-04 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-10-27 | Senate | Act No. 189 |
2014-10-27 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2014-10-20 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2014-10-20 | Senate | Signed in House |
2014-10-16 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2014-10-16 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments (48-0) |
2014-10-16 | Senate | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2014-10-14 | Senate | Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS |
2014-10-14 | Senate | In the Senate |
2014-10-14 | House | Final passage (190-2) |
2014-10-14 | House | Third consideration, with amendments |
2014-10-07 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2014-10-06 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2014-10-06 | House | Second consideration |
2014-09-22 | House | Removed from table |
2014-09-17 | House | Laid on the table |
2014-09-17 | House | First consideration |
2014-09-17 | House | Reported as amended |
2014-03-13 | House | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |
2014-03-12 | House | In the House |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (48-0) |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Second consideration |
2014-02-04 | Senate | First consideration |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2014-01-24 | Senate | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |