PA SB1235 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on July 15 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-07-22 - Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT
Pending: House State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act authorizing the Department of General Services, with the concurrence of the Department of Environmental Protection, to lease to L-A Battery, QOZ, LLC land within the bed of the Delaware River within the City of Philadelphia.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizing the Department of General Services, with the concurrence of the Department of Environmental Protection, to lease to L-A Battery, QOZ, LLC land within the bed of the Delaware River within the City of Philadelphia.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-07-15 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1235 PN 1853, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 46 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-13 - Senate - Senate State Government: Reported as Amended (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-22HouseReferred to STATE GOVERNMENT
2020-07-15HouseIn the House
2020-07-15SenateThird consideration and final passage (46-4)
2020-07-14SenateSecond consideration
2020-07-13SenateFirst consideration
2020-07-13SenateReported as amended
2020-07-12SenateReferred to STATE GOVERNMENT

Pennsylvania State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback