PA SB1228 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 9 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-10-19 - Re-reported as committed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 9 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-10-19 - Re-reported as committed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 42 (Judiciary and Judicial Procedure) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in juvenile matters, further providing for limitation on and change in place of commitment.
Title
In juvenile matters, further providing for limitation on and change in place of commitment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-10-19 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-07 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-07 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-10-19 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2022-06-29 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2022-06-29 | Senate | Second consideration |
2022-06-07 | Senate | First consideration |
2022-06-07 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2022-05-09 | Senate | Referred to JUDICIARY |