PA SB1225 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on October 19 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-10-20 - Referred to INSURANCE
Pending: House Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on October 19 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-10-20 - Referred to INSURANCE
Pending: House Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of May 17, 1921 (P.L.682, No.284), known as The Insurance Company Law of 1921, in casualty insurance, further providing for coverage for mammographic examinations and diagnostic breast imaging.
Title
In casualty insurance, further providing for coverage for mammographic examinations and diagnostic breast imaging.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-10-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1225 PN 1932, Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-10-18 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-09-20 - Senate - Senate Banking And Insurance: Adopt Amendment A05514 (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-09-20 - Senate - Senate Banking And Insurance: Reported as Amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-10-18 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-09-20 - Senate - Senate Banking And Insurance: Adopt Amendment A05514 (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-09-20 - Senate - Senate Banking And Insurance: Reported as Amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-10-20 | House | Referred to INSURANCE |
2022-10-19 | House | In the House |
2022-10-19 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2022-10-18 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2022-09-21 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2022-09-21 | Senate | Second consideration |
2022-09-20 | Senate | First consideration |
2022-09-20 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2022-05-09 | Senate | Referred to BANKING AND INSURANCE |