PA SB1225 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 16-8)
Status: Passed on November 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-11-01 - Act No. 210
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 16-8)
Status: Passed on November 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-11-01 - Act No. 210
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending Title 24 (Education) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, providing for public library code; and making related repeals.
Title
Providing for public library code; and making related repeals.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-10-17 - House - SB 1225 PN 2411, FP (Y: 191 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2012-10-17 - Senate - SB 1225 PN 2411, CONCUR IN HOUSE AMENDMENTS (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-10-17 - Senate - Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-08 - Senate - SB 1225 PN 2159, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-30 - Senate - Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-27 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-10-17 - Senate - SB 1225 PN 2411, CONCUR IN HOUSE AMENDMENTS (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-10-17 - Senate - Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-08 - Senate - SB 1225 PN 2159, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-30 - Senate - Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-27 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-11-01 | Senate | Act No. 210 |
2012-11-01 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2012-10-24 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2012-10-24 | Senate | Signed in House |
2012-10-17 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2012-10-17 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments (48-0) |
2012-10-17 | Senate | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2012-10-17 | Senate | Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS |
2012-10-17 | Senate | In the Senate |
2012-10-17 | House | Third consideration and final passage (191-0) |
2012-10-17 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2012-10-16 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2012-10-16 | House | Second consideration |
2012-10-01 | House | Removed from table |
2012-09-25 | House | Laid on the table |
2012-09-25 | House | First consideration |
2012-09-25 | House | Reported as amended |
2012-05-10 | House | Referred to EDUCATION |
2012-05-08 | House | In the House |
2012-05-08 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (47-0) |
2012-05-07 | Senate | Amended on third consideration |
2012-05-01 | Senate | Second consideration |
2012-04-30 | Senate | Re-reported as amended |
2012-03-28 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2012-03-27 | Senate | First consideration |
2012-03-27 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2011-08-30 | Senate | Referred to EDUCATION |