PA SB1216 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on November 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-25 - Act No. 136
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of March 10, 1949 (P.L.30, No.14), known as the Public School Code of 1949, in preliminary provisions, further providing for Keystone Exams and graduation requirements, for special provisions applicable to the Keystone Exams, graduation requirements and alternative competency assessment and for Special Education Funding Commission; in certification of teachers, further providing for instructional certificate grade spans and age levels and duties of department and providing for special provisions applicable to 2020-2021 school year; in pupils and attendance, providing for nonpublic school transportation for 2020-2021 school year; in terms and courses of study, further providing for pandemic of 2020; and, in educational tax credits, further providing for limitations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In preliminary provisions, further providing for Keystone Exams and graduation requirements, for special provisions applicable to the Keystone Exams, graduation requirements and alternative competency assessment and for Special Education Funding Commission; in certification of teachers, further providing for instructional certificate grade spans and age levels and duties of department and providing for special provisions applicable to 2020-2021 school year; in pupils and attendance, providing for nonpublic school transportation for 2020-2021 school year; in terms and courses of study, further providing for pandemic of 2020; and, in educational tax credits, further providing for limitations.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-11-20 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-20 - House - House Floor: SB 1216 PN 2126, CONCUR (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-18 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-18 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1216 PN 2126, CONCURRENCE IN HOUSE AMENDMENTS AS AMENDED (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-29 - House - House Floor: SB 1216 PN 2038, FP (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-29 - House - House Floor: SB 1216 PN 1950, 2019 A7235, LAWRENCE (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-17 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-16 - House - House Floor: SB 1216 PN 1899, 2019 A7126, LAWRENCE (Y: 199 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-16 - House - House Floor: SB 1216 PN 1899, 2019 A6991, KAUFFMAN (Y: 199 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-16 - House - House Floor: SB 1216 PN 1899, 2019 A6869, STEPHENS (Y: 201 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - House - House Education: Adopt Amendment A06778 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - House - House Education: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-15 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1216 PN 1784, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-15 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1216 PN 1784, A6716, SCHWANK AMENDMENT NO. A-6716 (Y: 23 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-07-14 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-22 - Senate - Senate Education: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-11-25HouseAct No. 136
2020-11-25HouseApproved by the Governor
2020-11-20HousePresented to the Governor
2020-11-20HouseSigned in House
2020-11-20HouseSigned in Senate
2020-11-20HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments to House amendments (202-0)
2020-11-20HouseRe-reported on concurrence, as committed
2020-11-19HouseReferred to RULES
2020-11-18HouseIn the House
2020-11-18SenateSenate concurred in House amendments, as amended by the Senate (49-0)
2020-11-18SenateRe-reported on concurrence, as amended
2020-10-05SenateReferred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS
2020-09-29SenateIn the Senate
2020-09-29HouseFinal passage (202-0)
2020-09-29HouseThird consideration, with amendments
2020-09-17HouseRe-reported as committed
2020-09-16HouseRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2020-09-16HouseSecond consideration, with amendments
2020-08-28HouseRemoved from table
2020-08-28HouseLaid on the table
2020-08-28HouseFirst consideration
2020-08-28HouseReported as amended
2020-07-30HouseReferred to EDUCATION
2020-07-15HouseIn the House
2020-07-15SenateThird consideration and final passage (50-0)
2020-07-14SenateRe-reported as committed
2020-06-23SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2020-06-23SenateSecond consideration
2020-06-22SenateFirst consideration
2020-06-22SenateReported as committed
2020-06-19SenateReferred to EDUCATION

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=S&type=B&bn=1216
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=1216&pn=1784
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=1216&pn=1899
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=1216&pn=1950
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=1216&pn=2038
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=1216&pn=2126
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=23&theDate=06/22/2020&RollCallId=987
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=07/14/2020&RollCallId=1064
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=606
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=607
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=12&theDate=08/20/2020&RollCallId=2394
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=12&theDate=08/20/2020&RollCallId=2393
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1591
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1592
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1593
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=09/17/2020&RollCallId=2498
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1620
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1621
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=757
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=17&theDate=11/18/2020&RollCallId=1293
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1759
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=44&theDate=11/20/2020&RollCallId=2659

Bill Comments

feedback