PA SB1214 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 24 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-06-30 - Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT
Pending: House State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act authorizing the Department of General Services, with the approval of the Department of Corrections and the Governor, to grant and convey to the Schuylkill County Municipal Authority an easement from lands of the Commonwealth of Pennsylvania at the State Correctional Institution Mahanoy situate in Mahanoy Township, County of Schuylkill, for the purpose of establishing, utilizing, and maintaining water wells and appurtenances thereto related to potable water production and distribution for the benefit of customers within the authority's service territory.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizing the Department of General Services, with the approval of the Department of Corrections and the Governor, to grant and convey to the Schuylkill County Municipal Authority an easement from lands of the Commonwealth of Pennsylvania at the State Correctional Institution Mahanoy situate in Mahanoy Township, County of Schuylkill, for the purpose of establishing, utilizing, and maintaining water wells and appurtenances thereto related to potable water production and distribution for the benefit of customers within the authority's service territory.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-24 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1214 PN 1783, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-22 - Senate - Senate State Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-30HouseReferred to STATE GOVERNMENT
2020-06-24HouseIn the House
2020-06-24SenateThird consideration and final passage (50-0)
2020-06-23SenateSecond consideration
2020-06-22SenateFirst consideration
2020-06-22SenateReported as committed
2020-06-18SenateReferred to STATE GOVERNMENT

Pennsylvania State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback