PA SB1209 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-4)
Status: Introduced on June 15 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-06-21 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of November 29, 2006 (P.L.1471, No.165), known as the Sexual Assault Testing and Evidence Collection Act, further providing for sexual assault evidence collection program; and requiring the Pennsylvania State Police to complete and submit a report.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Further providing for sexual assault evidence collection program; and requiring the Pennsylvania State Police to complete and submit a report.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-18 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-21SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2018-06-21SenateSecond consideration
2018-06-18SenateFirst consideration
2018-06-18SenateReported as committed
2018-06-15SenateReferred to JUDICIARY

Pennsylvania State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback