PA SB1209 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-4)
Status: Enrolled on October 17 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-10-17 - Presented to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of November 29, 2006 (P.L.1471, No.165), known as the Sexual Assault Testing and Evidence Collection Act, further providing for sexual assault evidence collection program; and requiring the Pennsylvania State Police to complete and submit a report.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Further providing for sexual assault evidence collection program; and requiring the Pennsylvania State Police to complete and submit a report.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-10-16 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-16 - House - House Floor: SB 1209 PN 1886, FP (Y: 189 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-10-09 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1209 PN 1886, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-24 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-10-17HousePresented to the Governor
2018-10-17HouseSigned in House
2018-10-16HouseSigned in Senate
2018-10-16HouseThird consideration and final passage (189-0)
2018-10-16HouseRe-reported as committed
2018-10-15HouseRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2018-10-15HouseSecond consideration
2018-10-11HouseRemoved from table
2018-10-09HouseLaid on the table
2018-10-09HouseFirst consideration
2018-10-09HouseReported as committed
2018-10-01HouseReferred to JUDICIARY
2018-09-26HouseIn the House
2018-09-26SenateThird consideration and final passage (48-0)
2018-09-24SenateRe-reported as committed
2018-06-21SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2018-06-21SenateSecond consideration
2018-06-18SenateFirst consideration
2018-06-18SenateReported as committed
2018-06-15SenateReferred to JUDICIARY

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=S&type=B&bn=1209
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=1209&pn=1886
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=39&theDate=06/18/2018&RollCallId=971
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=09/24/2018&RollCallId=1069
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=655
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=24&theDate=10/09/2018&RollCallId=2018
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1564
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=10/16/2018&RollCallId=2071

Bill Comments

feedback