PA SB120 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on October 20 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-10-21 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on October 20 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-10-21 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 23 (Domestic Relations) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in adoption, further providing for definitions, for hearing, for grounds for involuntary termination and for petition for involuntary termination, providing for notice if identity or whereabouts of birth parent or putative father unknown, further providing for consents necessary to adoption and repealing provisions relating to consents not naming adopting parents.
Title
In adoption, further providing for definitions, for hearing, for grounds for involuntary termination and for petition for involuntary termination, providing for notice if identity or whereabouts of birth parent or putative father unknown, further providing for consents necessary to adoption and repealing provisions relating to consents not naming adopting parents.
Sponsors
Sen. Giovanni DiSanto [R] | Sen. Jay Costa [D] | Sen. Michael Folmer [R] | Sen. Scott Martin [R] |
Sen. Kim Ward [R] | Sen. Donald White [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-10-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 120 PN 86, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-19 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-22 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-19 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-22 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-21 | House | Referred to JUDICIARY |
2020-10-20 | House | In the House |
2020-10-20 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (48-0) |
2020-10-19 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2020-10-06 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-10-06 | Senate | Second consideration |
2020-09-22 | Senate | First consideration |
2020-09-22 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Referred to JUDICIARY |