PA SB1193 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on November 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-25 - Act No. 134
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Title 44 (Law and Justice) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in other officers, codifying provisions relating to sheriffs and deputy sheriffs; further providing for sheriff training requirement and for Sheriff and Deputy Sheriff Education and Training Account; and making editorial changes and a related repeal.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In other officers, codifying provisions relating to sheriffs and deputy sheriffs; further providing for sheriff training requirement and for Sheriff and Deputy Sheriff Education and Training Account; and making editorial changes and a related repeal.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-11-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1193 PN 2025, CONCUR IN HOUSE AMENDMENTS (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-20 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-19 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-19 - House - House Floor: SB 1193 PN 2025, FP (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-29 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-29 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A07371 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-29 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A07327 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1193 PN 1756, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-23 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-11-25SenateAct No. 134
2020-11-25SenateApproved by the Governor
2020-11-20SenatePresented to the Governor
2020-11-20SenateSigned in House
2020-11-20SenateSigned in Senate
2020-11-20SenateSenate concurred in House amendments (49-0)
2020-11-20SenateRe-reported on concurrence, as committed
2020-11-19SenateReferred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS
2020-11-19SenateIn the Senate
2020-11-19HouseThird consideration and final passage (202-0)
2020-11-19HouseRe-reported as committed
2020-10-21HouseRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2020-10-21HouseSecond consideration
2020-10-20HouseRemoved from table
2020-09-29HouseLaid on the table
2020-09-29HouseFirst consideration
2020-09-29HouseReported as amended
2020-07-08HouseReferred to JUDICIARY
2020-06-29HouseIn the House
2020-06-29SenateThird consideration and final passage (50-0)
2020-06-23SenateRe-reported as committed
2020-06-22SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2020-06-22SenateSecond consideration
2020-06-10SenateFirst consideration
2020-06-10SenateReported as committed
2020-06-08SenateReferred to JUDICIARY

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=S&type=B&bn=1193
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=1193&pn=1756
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=1193&pn=2025
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=39&theDate=06/10/2020&RollCallId=958
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=06/23/2020&RollCallId=1008
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=566
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=24&theDate=09/29/2020&RollCallId=2504
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=24&theDate=09/29/2020&RollCallId=2505
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=24&theDate=09/29/2020&RollCallId=2506
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1747
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=11/19/2020&RollCallId=2650
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=17&theDate=11/20/2020&RollCallId=1302
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=772

Bill Comments

feedback