PA SB1189 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Engrossed on September 22 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-23 - Referred to HEALTH
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 22 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-23 - Referred to HEALTH
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of April 23, 1956 (1955 P.L.1510, No.500), known as the Disease Prevention and Control Law of 1955, further providing for definitions and for control measures.
Title
Further providing for definitions and for control measures.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-09-22 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1189 PN 2007, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 33 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-21 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Reported as Committed (Y: 15 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1189 PN 1855, A7150, WARD, KIM AMENDMENT NO. A-7150 (Y: 35 N: 13 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-15 - Senate - Senate Health And Human Services: Reported as Amended (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-21 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Reported as Committed (Y: 15 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1189 PN 1855, A7150, WARD, KIM AMENDMENT NO. A-7150 (Y: 35 N: 13 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-15 - Senate - Senate Health And Human Services: Reported as Amended (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-23 | House | Referred to HEALTH |
2020-09-22 | House | In the House |
2020-09-22 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (33-16) |
2020-09-21 | Senate | Amended on third consideration (35-13) |
2020-09-21 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2020-09-09 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-09-09 | Senate | Second consideration |
2020-07-15 | Senate | First consideration |
2020-07-15 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2020-06-09 | Senate | Referred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES |