PA SB1188 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Engrossed on June 22 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-24 - Referred to HEALTH
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 22 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-24 - Referred to HEALTH
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act providing for patient access to diagnostics and treatments for Lyme disease and related tick-borne illnesses; and requiring health care policies to provide certain coverage.
Title
Providing for patient access to diagnostics and treatments for Lyme disease and related tick-borne illnesses; and requiring health care policies to provide certain coverage.
Sponsors
Sen. Michele Brooks [R] | Sen. Wayne Langerholc [R] | Sen. Jay Costa [D] | Sen. Michael Regan [R] |
Sen. Doug Mastriano [R] | Sen. Judith Ward [R] | Sen. Sharif Street [D] | Sen. Lindsey Williams [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-06-22 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-22 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1188 PN 1585, Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-12 - Senate - Senate Health And Human Services: Adopt Amendment A03944 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-12 - Senate - Senate Health And Human Services: Reported as Amended (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-22 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1188 PN 1585, Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-12 - Senate - Senate Health And Human Services: Adopt Amendment A03944 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-12 - Senate - Senate Health And Human Services: Reported as Amended (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-24 | House | Referred to HEALTH |
2022-06-22 | House | In the House |
2022-06-22 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2022-06-22 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2022-06-13 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2022-06-13 | Senate | Second consideration |
2022-04-12 | Senate | First consideration |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Referred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES |