PA SB1188 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Passed on July 23 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-23 - Act No. 76
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of December 31, 1965 (P.L.1257, No.511), known as The Local Tax Enabling Act, in local taxes, further providing for delegation of taxing powers and restrictions thereon and for tax limitations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In local taxes, further providing for delegation of taxing powers and restrictions thereon and for tax limitations.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-07-14 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-14 - House - House Floor: SB 1188 PN 1802, FP (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-07-07 - House - House Finance: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-23 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1188 PN 1802, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-22 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-23HouseAct No. 76
2020-07-23HouseApproved by the Governor
2020-07-15HousePresented to the Governor
2020-07-14HouseSigned in House
2020-07-14HouseSigned in Senate
2020-07-14HouseThird consideration and final passage (201-0)
2020-07-14HouseRe-reported as committed
2020-07-13HouseRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2020-07-13HouseSecond consideration
2020-07-08HouseRemoved from table
2020-07-07HouseLaid on the table
2020-07-07HouseFirst consideration
2020-07-07HouseReported as committed
2020-06-29HouseReferred to FINANCE
2020-06-23HouseIn the House
2020-06-23SenateThird consideration and final passage (49-0)
2020-06-22SenateAmended on third consideration
2020-06-22SenateRe-reported as committed
2020-06-10SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2020-06-10SenateSecond consideration
2020-06-09SenateFirst consideration
2020-06-09SenateReported as amended
2020-06-05SenateReferred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=S&type=B&bn=1188
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=1188&pn=1751
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=1188&pn=1767
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=1188&pn=1802
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=15&theDate=06/09/2020&RollCallId=940
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=06/22/2020&RollCallId=969
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=543
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=16&theDate=07/07/2020&RollCallId=2323
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1524
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=07/14/2020&RollCallId=2389

Bill Comments

feedback