PA SB1186 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-07 - Act No. 51 of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-07 - Act No. 51 of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 75 (Vehicles) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in registration plates, further providing for USA semiquincentennial registration plates and establishing the Semiquincentennial Restricted Account.
Title
In registration plates, further providing for USA semiquincentennial registration plates and establishing the Semiquincentennial Restricted Account.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-22 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-22 - House - House Floor: SB 1186 PN 1544, FP (Y: 199 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-06-15 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1186 PN 1544, Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-06 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Committed (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-22 - House - House Floor: SB 1186 PN 1544, FP (Y: 199 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-06-15 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1186 PN 1544, Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-06 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Committed (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-07 | House | Act No. 51 of 2022 |
2022-07-07 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2022-06-29 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2022-06-29 | House | Signed in House |
2022-06-28 | House | Signed in Senate |
2022-06-22 | House | Third consideration and final passage (199-0) |
2022-06-22 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2022-06-21 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2022-06-21 | House | Second consideration |
2022-06-20 | House | Removed from table |
2022-06-15 | House | Laid on the table |
2022-06-15 | House | First consideration |
2022-06-15 | House | Reported as committed |
2022-05-24 | House | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |
2022-05-23 | House | In the House |
2022-05-23 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (47-0) |
2022-05-23 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Second consideration |
2022-04-06 | Senate | First consideration |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |