PA SB1182 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-2)
Status: Engrossed on September 24 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-10-07 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act providing for the medical use of cannabis in the Commonwealth of Pennsylvania.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing for the medical use of cannabis in the Commonwealth of Pennsylvania.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-09-23 - Senate - Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 17 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-27 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-10-07HouseReferred to JUDICIARY
2014-09-24HouseIn the House
2014-09-24SenateThird consideration and final passage (43-7)
2014-09-23SenateSecond consideration
2014-09-23SenateRe-reported as amended
2014-07-01SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2014-06-27SenateFirst consideration
2014-06-27SenateReported as amended
2014-01-15SenateReferred to LAW AND JUSTICE

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2013&sind=0&body=S&type=B&bn=1182
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2013&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=1182&pn=1701
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2013&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=1182&pn=2221
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2013&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=1182&pn=2324
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2013&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=29&theDate=06/27/2014&rNbr=1041
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2013&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=09/23/2014&rNbr=1153

Bill Comments

feedback