PA SB1180 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 13-6)
Status: Introduced on June 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-30 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-30 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 4, 1971 (P.L.6, No.2), known as the Tax Reform Code of 1971, providing for volunteer firefighter tax credit.
Title
Providing for volunteer firefighter tax credit.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-23 - Senate - Senate Finance: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-30 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-06-30 | Senate | Second consideration |
2020-06-23 | Senate | First consideration |
2020-06-23 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2020-06-04 | Senate | Referred to FINANCE |