PA SB1176 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on October 3 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-10-05 - Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT
Pending: House Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on October 3 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-10-05 - Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT
Pending: House Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 53 (Municipalities Generally) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in home rule and optional plan government, further providing for submission of question for election of government study commission and for limitation on enactment of ordinance or filing of petition.
Title
In home rule and optional plan government, further providing for submission of question for election of government study commission and for limitation on enactment of ordinance or filing of petition.
Sponsors
Sen. Gene Yaw [R] | Sen. Scott Martin [R] | Sen. Robert Mensch [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-10-03 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1176 PN 1756, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-25 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-25 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-10-05 | House | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2018-10-03 | House | In the House |
2018-10-03 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (48-0) |
2018-09-25 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2018-06-18 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2018-06-18 | Senate | Second consideration |
2018-06-12 | Senate | First consideration |
2018-06-12 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2018-05-21 | Senate | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |