PA SB1169 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-4)
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-04 - Referred to AGRICULTURE AND RURAL AFFAIRS
Pending: House Agriculture & Rural Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-04 - Referred to AGRICULTURE AND RURAL AFFAIRS
Pending: House Agriculture & Rural Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending the act of December 18, 1987 (P.L.412, No.86), known as the Pennsylvania Fair Dealership Law, further providing for definitions, for termination of dealer agreement and for death or incapacitation of dealer; repealing provisions relating to coercion; and providing for unlawful acts by supplier and for waiver.
Title
Further providing for definitions, for termination of dealer agreement and for death or incapacitation of dealer; repealing provisions relating to coercion; and providing for unlawful acts by supplier and for waiver.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-28 - Senate - SB 1169 PN 2038, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 37 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-26 - Senate - Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 18 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-12-14 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-26 - Senate - Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 18 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-12-14 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-04 | House | Referred to AGRICULTURE AND RURAL AFFAIRS |
2012-03-28 | House | In the House |
2012-03-28 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (37-11) |
2012-03-27 | Senate | Second consideration |
2012-03-26 | Senate | Re-reported as amended |
2012-01-25 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2011-12-14 | Senate | First consideration |
2011-12-14 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2011-06-23 | Senate | Referred to AGRICULTURE AND RURAL AFFAIRS |