PA SB1168 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on December 4 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-12-09 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 4 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-12-09 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 18 (Crimes and Offenses) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in wiretapping and electronic surveillance, further providing for exceptions to prohibition of interception and disclosure of communications.
Title
In wiretapping and electronic surveillance, further providing for exceptions to prohibition of interception and disclosure of communications.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-12-04 - Senate - SB 1168 PN 1546, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 46 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-11-19 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-11-19 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-12-09 | House | Referred to JUDICIARY |
2013-12-04 | House | In the House |
2013-12-04 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (46-2) |
2013-12-03 | Senate | Second consideration |
2013-11-19 | Senate | First consideration |
2013-11-19 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2013-11-12 | Senate | Referred to JUDICIARY |