PA SB1158 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Introduced on May 18 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-05 - Re-reported as committed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 18 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-05 - Re-reported as committed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 35 (Health and Safety) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in Commonwealth services, further providing for general authority of Governor.
Title
In Commonwealth services, further providing for general authority of Governor.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-10-05 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Amended (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Amended (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-05 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2020-09-08 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-09-08 | Senate | Second consideration |
2020-06-24 | Senate | First consideration |
2020-06-24 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2020-05-18 | Senate | Referred to JUDICIARY |