PA SB1153 | 2007-2008 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2008 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-09-16 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2008 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-09-16 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Summary
An Act amending Title 42 (Judiciary and Judicial Procedure) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, further providing for the Minor Judiciary Education Board and for the course of instruction and examination for certain minor judiciary.
Title
An Act amending Title 42 (Judiciary and Judicial Procedure) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, further providing for the Minor Judiciary Education Board and for the course of instruction and examination for certain minor judiciary.
Sponsors
Sen. Jay Costa [D] | Sen. Stewart Greenleaf [R] | Sen. Raphael Musto [D] | Sen. Michael O'Pake [D] |
Sen. John Rafferty [R] | Sen. Leanna Washington [D] | Sen. Michael Waugh [R] | Sen. Mary White [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-09-16 | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2008-09-16 | Removed from table | |
2008-09-15 | Laid on the table | |
2008-09-15 | First consideration | |
2008-09-15 | Reported as committed | |
2008-03-24 | Referred to JUDICIARY | |
2008-03-18 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2008-03-17 | Amended on third consideration | |
2008-03-12 | Second consideration | |
2008-03-10 | Re-reported as committed | |
2007-12-03 | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2007-11-20 | First consideration | |
2007-11-20 | Reported as committed | |
2007-11-07 | Corrective Reprint, Printer's No. 1538 | |
2007-11-05 | Referred to JUDICIARY |
Pennsylvania State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2007&sind=0&body=S&type=B&bn=1153 |