PA SB1142 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-22 - Act No. 44
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-22 - Act No. 44
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 10, 1949 (P.L.30, No.14), known as the Public School Code of 1949, in school finances, further providing for intergovernmental agreements for school security and safety; in grounds and buildings, further providing for school police officers; in safe schools, further providing for the Office for Safe Schools; providing for school safety and security and for school police officers and school resource officers; establishing the School Safety and Security Fund; establishing the Safe2Say Program; and providing for methods of anonymous reporting concerning unsafe activities in schools.
Title
In school finances, further providing for intergovernmental agreements for school security and safety; in grounds and buildings, further providing for school police officers; in safe schools, further providing for the Office for Safe Schools; providing for school safety and security and for school police officers and school resource officers; establishing the School Safety and Security Fund; establishing the Safe2Say Program; and providing for methods of anonymous reporting concerning unsafe activities in schools.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-22 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1142 PN 1911, CONCUR IN HOUSE AMENDMENTS (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-22 - House - House Floor: SB 1142 PN 1911, FP (Y: 194 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-06-22 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt Amendment A08878 (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Amended (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - House - House Education: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-06 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1142 PN 1828, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-21 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Senate Education: Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-22 - House - House Floor: SB 1142 PN 1911, FP (Y: 194 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-06-22 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt Amendment A08878 (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Amended (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - House - House Education: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-06 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1142 PN 1828, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-21 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Senate Education: Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-22 | Senate | Act No. 44 |
2018-06-22 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2018-06-22 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2018-06-22 | Senate | Signed in House |
2018-06-22 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2018-06-22 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments (47-1) |
2018-06-22 | Senate | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2018-06-22 | Senate | Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS |
2018-06-22 | Senate | In the Senate |
2018-06-22 | House | Third consideration and final passage (194-0) |
2018-06-21 | House | Re-reported as amended |
2018-06-21 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2018-06-21 | House | Second consideration |
2018-06-20 | House | Removed from table |
2018-06-19 | House | Laid on the table |
2018-06-19 | House | First consideration |
2018-06-19 | House | Reported as committed |
2018-06-08 | House | Referred to EDUCATION |
2018-06-06 | House | In the House |
2018-06-06 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2018-06-05 | Senate | Amended on third consideration |
2018-05-21 | Senate | Amended on third consideration |
2018-05-21 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Second consideration |
2018-04-24 | Senate | First consideration |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2018-04-20 | Senate | Referred to EDUCATION |