PA SB1142 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-22 - Act No. 44
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of March 10, 1949 (P.L.30, No.14), known as the Public School Code of 1949, in school finances, further providing for intergovernmental agreements for school security and safety; in grounds and buildings, further providing for school police officers; in safe schools, further providing for the Office for Safe Schools; providing for school safety and security and for school police officers and school resource officers; establishing the School Safety and Security Fund; establishing the Safe2Say Program; and providing for methods of anonymous reporting concerning unsafe activities in schools.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In school finances, further providing for intergovernmental agreements for school security and safety; in grounds and buildings, further providing for school police officers; in safe schools, further providing for the Office for Safe Schools; providing for school safety and security and for school police officers and school resource officers; establishing the School Safety and Security Fund; establishing the Safe2Say Program; and providing for methods of anonymous reporting concerning unsafe activities in schools.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-22 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1142 PN 1911, CONCUR IN HOUSE AMENDMENTS (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-22 - House - House Floor: SB 1142 PN 1911, FP (Y: 194 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-06-22 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt Amendment A08878 (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Amended (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - House - House Education: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-06 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1142 PN 1828, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-21 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Senate Education: Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-22SenateAct No. 44
2018-06-22SenateApproved by the Governor
2018-06-22SenatePresented to the Governor
2018-06-22SenateSigned in House
2018-06-22SenateSigned in Senate
2018-06-22SenateSenate concurred in House amendments (47-1)
2018-06-22SenateRe-reported on concurrence, as committed
2018-06-22SenateReferred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS
2018-06-22SenateIn the Senate
2018-06-22HouseThird consideration and final passage (194-0)
2018-06-21HouseRe-reported as amended
2018-06-21HouseRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2018-06-21HouseSecond consideration
2018-06-20HouseRemoved from table
2018-06-19HouseLaid on the table
2018-06-19HouseFirst consideration
2018-06-19HouseReported as committed
2018-06-08HouseReferred to EDUCATION
2018-06-06HouseIn the House
2018-06-06SenateThird consideration and final passage (49-0)
2018-06-05SenateAmended on third consideration
2018-05-21SenateAmended on third consideration
2018-05-21SenateRe-reported as committed
2018-04-25SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2018-04-25SenateSecond consideration
2018-04-24SenateFirst consideration
2018-04-24SenateReported as committed
2018-04-20SenateReferred to EDUCATION

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=S&type=B&bn=1142
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=1142&pn=1678
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=1142&pn=1764
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=1142&pn=1828
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=1142&pn=1911
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=23&theDate=04/24/2018&RollCallId=805
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=05/21/2018&RollCallId=842
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=532
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=12&theDate=06/19/2018&RollCallId=1688
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=06/21/2018&RollCallId=1827
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=06/21/2018&RollCallId=1825
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=17&theDate=06/22/2018&RollCallId=1052
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1406
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=627

Bill Comments

feedback