PA SB1135 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-7)
Status: Passed on October 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-10-27 - Act No. 188
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-7)
Status: Passed on October 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-10-27 - Act No. 188
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of May 28, 1937 (P.L.955, No.265), referred to as the Housing Authorities Law, further providing for establishment of rentals and selection of tenants; and providing for veteran preferences.
Title
Further providing for establishment of rentals and selection of tenants; and providing for veteran preferences.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-10-16 - Senate - Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-18 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-18 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-10-27 | Senate | Act No. 188 |
2014-10-27 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2014-10-20 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2014-10-20 | Senate | Signed in House |
2014-10-16 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2014-10-16 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments (48-0) |
2014-10-16 | Senate | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2014-10-15 | Senate | Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS |
2014-10-15 | Senate | In the Senate |
2014-10-15 | House | Third consideration and final passage (196-1) |
2014-10-15 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2014-10-14 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2014-10-14 | House | Second consideration |
2014-10-14 | House | Removed from table |
2014-09-15 | House | Laid on the table |
2014-09-15 | House | First consideration |
2014-09-15 | House | Reported as amended |
2014-07-01 | House | Referred to URBAN AFFAIRS |
2014-07-01 | House | In the House |
2014-07-01 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2014-06-23 | Senate | Second consideration |
2014-06-18 | Senate | First consideration |
2014-06-18 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2014-01-13 | Senate | Referred to URBAN AFFAIRS AND HOUSING |