PA SB1134 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on September 26 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-10-01 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Title 18 (Crimes and Offenses) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in sexual offenses, providing for the offense of sexual extortion.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In sexual offenses, providing for the offense of sexual extortion.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-09-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1134 PN 1649, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-10-01HouseReferred to JUDICIARY
2018-09-26HouseIn the House
2018-09-26SenateThird consideration and final passage (48-0)
2018-09-24SenateRemoved from table
2018-09-24SenateLaid on the table
2018-09-24SenateSecond consideration
2018-06-05SenateFirst consideration
2018-06-05SenateReported as committed
2018-04-16SenateReferred to JUDICIARY

Pennsylvania State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback