PA SB113 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-04 - Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-04 - Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act selecting, designating and adopting the Pennsylvania March as the official march of the Commonwealth of Pennsylvania.
Title
Selecting, designating and adopting the Pennsylvania March as the official march of the Commonwealth of Pennsylvania.
Sponsors
Sen. Mario Scavello [R] | Sen. Patrick Browne [R] | Sen. Joe Pittman [R] | Sen. Camera Bartolotta [R] |
Sen. Judith Ward [R] | Sen. John Yudichak [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-01-27 - Senate - Senate State Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-04 | Senate | Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9) |
2021-12-15 | Senate | Removed from table |
2021-12-15 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2021-10-18 | Senate | Removed from table |
2021-10-18 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2021-06-21 | Senate | Removed from table |
2021-06-21 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Removed from table |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Removed from table |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Second consideration |
2021-01-27 | Senate | First consideration |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |