PA SB113 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 16-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-28 - Act No. 1
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of July 8, 1978 (P.L.752, No.140), known as the Public Employee Pension Forfeiture Act, further providing for definitions, for disqualification and forfeiture of benefits and for restitution for monetary loss; and repealing a retroactivity provision.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Further providing for definitions, for disqualification and forfeiture of benefits and for restitution for monetary loss; and repealing a retroactivity provision.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 113 PN 398, CONCUR IN HOUSE AMENDMENTS (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - House - House Floor: SB 113 PN 398, FP (Y: 194 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A00148 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House State Government: Re-refer Bill To Another Committee (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 113 PN 58, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - Senate Finance: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-28SenateAct No. 1
2019-03-28SenateApproved by the Governor
2019-03-20SenatePresented to the Governor
2019-03-20SenateSigned in House
2019-03-20SenateSigned in Senate
2019-03-20SenateSenate concurred in House amendments (44-0)
2019-03-19SenateRe-reported on concurrence, as committed
2019-03-19SenateReferred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS
2019-03-19SenateIn the Senate
2019-03-19HouseThird consideration and final passage (194-1)
2019-03-19HouseRe-reported as committed
2019-03-18HouseRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-03-18HouseSecond consideration
2019-03-13HouseRemoved from table
2019-03-12HouseLaid on the table
2019-03-12HouseFirst consideration
2019-03-12HouseReported as amended
2019-02-21HouseRe-referred to JUDICIARY
2019-02-21HouseReported with request to re-refer to JUDICIARY
2019-02-05HouseReferred to STATE GOVERNMENT
2019-02-04HouseIn the House
2019-02-04SenateThird consideration and final passage (49-0)
2019-01-30SenateRe-reported as committed
2019-01-30SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-01-30SenateSecond consideration
2019-01-29SenateFirst consideration
2019-01-29SenateReported as committed
2019-01-23SenateReferred to FINANCE

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=S&type=B&bn=113
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0113&pn=0058
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0113&pn=0398
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=25&theDate=01/29/2019&RollCallId=6
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=01/30/2019&RollCallId=7
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=9
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=36&theDate=02/20/2019&RollCallId=37
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=24&theDate=03/12/2019&RollCallId=82
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=24&theDate=03/12/2019&RollCallId=83
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=94
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=17&theDate=03/19/2019&RollCallId=49
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=03/19/2019&RollCallId=149
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=24

Bill Comments

feedback