PA SB1124 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 21 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-22 - Referred to HEALTH
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 21 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-22 - Referred to HEALTH
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of June 13, 1967 (P.L.31, No.21), known as the Human Services Code, in public assistance, further providing for uniformity in administration of assistance and regulations as to assistance.
Title
In public assistance, further providing for uniformity in administration of assistance and regulations as to assistance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1124 PN 1464, Final Passage (Y: 30 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-20 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 15 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-12 - Senate - Senate Health And Human Services: Reported as Committed (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-20 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 15 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-12 - Senate - Senate Health And Human Services: Reported as Committed (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-22 | House | Referred to HEALTH |
2022-06-21 | House | In the House |
2022-06-21 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (30-20) |
2022-06-20 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2022-05-23 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2022-05-23 | Senate | Second consideration |
2022-04-12 | Senate | First consideration |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Referred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES |