PA SB1119 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-29 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-29 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 42 (Judiciary and Judicial Procedure) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in limitation of time, providing for declaration of judicial emergencies.
Title
In limitation of time, providing for declaration of judicial emergencies.
Sponsors
Sen. Lisa Baker [R] | Sen. Lawrence Farnese [D] | Sen. Thomas Killion [R] | Sen. Kim Ward [R] |
Sen. Dave Arnold [R] | Sen. Judith Ward [R] | Sen. Michael Regan [R] | Sen. Patrick Stefano [R] |
Sen. Mario Scavello [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-04-29 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1119 PN 1662, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-28 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-20 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1119 PN 1662, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-28 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-20 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-29 | House | Referred to JUDICIARY |
2020-04-29 | House | In the House |
2020-04-29 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2020-04-29 | Senate | Re-reported as amended |
2020-04-28 | Senate | Re-committed to JUDICIARY |
2020-04-28 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2020-04-21 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-04-21 | Senate | Second consideration |
2020-04-20 | Senate | First consideration |
2020-04-20 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2020-04-17 | Senate | Referred to JUDICIARY |