PA SB1114 | 2007-2008 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on December 11 2007 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-11-12 - House concurred in Senate amendments to House amendments
Status: Engrossed on December 11 2007 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-11-12 - House concurred in Senate amendments to House amendments
Summary
An Act designating the scenic view adjacent to State Route 40 in Wharton Township, Fayette County, as the "Blue Star Point Lookout"; designating the portion of US Route 20, known as West 26th Street, in Millcreek Township, Erie County, from Peninsula Drive to Powell Avenue as the John W. Groters Memorial Highway; designating a portion of Cottman Avenue (Route 73), Burholme section, City of Philadelphia, as the Police Sergeant Stephen Liczbinski Memorial Highway; and designating the bridge on State Route 259 dividing Bolivar Borough and Fairfield Township, Westmoreland County, as the Glenn McMaster Memorial Bridge.
Title
An Act designating the scenic view adjacent to State Route 40 in Wharton Township, Fayette County, as the "Blue Star Point Lookout"; designating the portion of US Route 20, known as West 26th Street, in Millcreek Township, Erie County, from Peninsula Drive to Powell Avenue as the John W. Groters Memorial Highway; designating a portion of Cottman Avenue (Route 73), Burholme section, City of Philadelphia, as the Police Sergeant Stephen Liczbinski Memorial Highway; and designating the bridge on State Route 259 dividing Bolivar Borough and Fairfield Township, Westmoreland County, as the Glenn McMaster Memorial Bridge.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-11-12 | House concurred in Senate amendments to House amendments | |
2008-11-12 | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed | |
2008-10-08 | Referred to RULES | |
2008-10-08 | Senate concurred in House amendments, as amended by the Senate | |
2008-10-07 | Re-reported on concurrence, as amended | |
2008-10-07 | Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS | |
2008-10-07 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2008-10-06 | Second consideration, with amendments | |
2008-09-23 | Re-reported as committed | |
2008-05-15 | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2008-05-15 | Removed from table | |
2008-05-14 | Laid on the table | |
2008-05-14 | First consideration | |
2008-05-14 | Reported as amended | |
2007-12-13 | Referred to TRANSPORTATION | |
2007-12-11 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2007-11-28 | Second consideration | |
2007-11-27 | First consideration | |
2007-11-27 | Reported as committed | |
2007-10-19 | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |
Pennsylvania State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2007&sind=0&body=S&type=B&bn=1114 |