PA SB1112 | 2007-2008 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on October 7 2008 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-11-12 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Status: Engrossed on October 7 2008 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-11-12 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Summary
An Act amending the act of June 24, 1976 (P.L.424, No.101), referred to as the Emergency and Law Enforcement Personnel Death Benefits Act, further providing for death benefit eligibility; and repealing certain provisions of the Municipal Police Pension Law and the Municipal Pension Plan Funding Standard and Recovery Act.
Title
An Act amending the act of June 24, 1976 (P.L.424, No.101), referred to as the Emergency and Law Enforcement Personnel Death Benefits Act, further providing for death benefit eligibility; and repealing certain provisions of the Municipal Police Pension Law and the Municipal Pension Plan Funding Standard and Recovery Act.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-11-12 | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2008-11-12 | Removed from table | |
2008-11-12 | Laid on the table | |
2008-11-12 | First consideration | |
2008-11-12 | Reported as committed | |
2008-10-07 | Referred to FINANCE | |
2008-10-07 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2008-10-06 | Second consideration | |
2008-10-06 | Re-reported as committed | |
2008-06-26 | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2008-06-17 | First consideration | |
2008-06-17 | Reported as amended | |
2007-10-25 | Referred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY |
Pennsylvania State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2007&sind=0&body=S&type=B&bn=1112 |