PA SB1110 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 8 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-21 - Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 8 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-21 - Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act making appropriations from the Public School Employees' Retirement Fund and from the PSERS Defined Contribution Fund to provide for expenses of the Public School Employees' Retirement Board for the fiscal year July 1, 2022, to June 30, 2023, and for the payment of bills incurred and remaining unpaid at the close of the fiscal year ending June 30, 2022.
Title
Making appropriations from the Public School Employees' Retirement Fund and from the PSERS Defined Contribution Fund to provide for expenses of the Public School Employees' Retirement Board for the fiscal year July 1, 2022, to June 30, 2023, and for the payment of bills incurred and remaining unpaid at the close of the fiscal year ending June 30, 2022.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-15 - House - House Appropriations: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-08 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1110 PN 1723, Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-07 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt Amendment A04394 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-07 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-12 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-08 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1110 PN 1723, Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-07 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt Amendment A04394 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-07 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-12 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-21 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2022-06-21 | House | Second consideration |
2022-06-20 | House | Removed from table |
2022-06-15 | House | Laid on the table |
2022-06-15 | House | First consideration |
2022-06-15 | House | Reported as committed |
2022-06-08 | House | Referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2022-06-08 | House | In the House |
2022-06-08 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2022-06-07 | Senate | Re-reported as amended |
2022-04-13 | Senate | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2022-04-13 | Senate | Second consideration |
2022-04-12 | Senate | First consideration |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Referred to APPROPRIATIONS |