PA SB1106 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 6 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-04-28 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of June 28, 1935 (P.L.477, No.193), referred to as the Enforcement Officer Disability Benefits Law (Heart and Lung Act), further providing for disability benefits.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amending the act of June 28, 1935 (P.L.477, No.193), referred to as the Enforcement Officer Disability Benefits Law (Heart and Lung Act), further providing for disability benefits.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-04-15 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-07 - Senate - Senate Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-28SenateLaid on the table
2020-04-15SenateRe-reported as committed
2020-04-15SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2020-04-15SenateSecond consideration
2020-04-07SenateFirst consideration
2020-04-07SenateReported as committed
2020-04-06SenateReferred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS

Pennsylvania State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback