PA SB1105 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-08 - Act No. 2A of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-08 - Act No. 2A of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act making appropriations to the Trustees of the University of Pennsylvania.
Title
Making appropriations to the Trustees of the University of Pennsylvania.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-07-06 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-07-06 - House - House Floor: SB 1105 PN 1763, FP (Y: 196 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-21 - House - House Appropriations: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1105 PN 1763, Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-14 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Senate Bill 1105 PN -1 - Adopt Amendment A04582 (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-14 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Reported as Amended (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-12 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-07-06 - House - House Floor: SB 1105 PN 1763, FP (Y: 196 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-21 - House - House Appropriations: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1105 PN 1763, Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-14 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Senate Bill 1105 PN -1 - Adopt Amendment A04582 (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-14 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Reported as Amended (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-12 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-08 | House | Act No. 2A of 2022 |
2022-07-08 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2022-07-08 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2022-07-07 | House | Signed in House |
2022-07-06 | House | Signed in Senate |
2022-07-06 | House | Third consideration and final passage (196-4) |
2022-07-06 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2022-06-27 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2022-06-27 | House | Second consideration |
2022-06-22 | House | Removed from table |
2022-06-21 | House | Laid on the table |
2022-06-21 | House | First consideration |
2022-06-21 | House | Reported as committed |
2022-06-21 | House | Referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2022-06-20 | House | In the House |
2022-06-20 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2022-06-14 | Senate | Re-reported as amended |
2022-04-13 | Senate | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2022-04-13 | Senate | Second consideration |
2022-04-12 | Senate | First consideration |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Referred to APPROPRIATIONS |