PA SB1101 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-3)
Status: Passed on June 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-28 - Act No. 74
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Title 75 (Vehicles) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in certificate of title and security interests, further providing for content and effect of certificate of title and for theft vehicles.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In certificate of title and security interests, further providing for content and effect of certificate of title and for theft vehicles.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-22 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-22 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1101 PN 1875, CONCUR IN HOUSE AMENDMENTS (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-22 - House - House Floor: SB 1101 PN 1875, FP (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-06-22 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - House - House Transportation: Adopt Amendment A07549 (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-23 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1101 PN 1719, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-28SenateAct No. 74
2018-06-28SenateApproved by the Governor
2018-06-25SenatePresented to the Governor
2018-06-25SenateSigned in House
2018-06-22SenateSigned in Senate
2018-06-22SenateSenate concurred in House amendments (48-0)
2018-06-22SenateRe-reported on concurrence, as committed
2018-06-22SenateReferred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS
2018-06-22SenateIn the Senate
2018-06-22HouseThird consideration and final passage (195-0)
2018-06-22HouseRe-reported as committed
2018-06-21HouseRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2018-06-21HouseSecond consideration
2018-06-20HouseRemoved from table
2018-06-13HouseLaid on the table
2018-06-13HouseFirst consideration
2018-06-13HouseReported as amended
2018-05-24HouseReferred to TRANSPORTATION
2018-05-23HouseIn the House
2018-05-23SenateThird consideration and final passage (49-0)
2018-05-21SenateSecond consideration
2018-04-25SenateFirst consideration
2018-04-25SenateReported as amended
2018-04-06SenateReferred to TRANSPORTATION

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=S&type=B&bn=1101
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=1101&pn=1624
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=1101&pn=1719
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=1101&pn=1875
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=19&theDate=04/25/2018&RollCallId=821
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=506
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=38&theDate=06/12/2018&RollCallId=1675
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=38&theDate=06/12/2018&RollCallId=1676
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=06/22/2018&RollCallId=1845
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1420
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=632
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=17&theDate=06/22/2018&RollCallId=1051

Bill Comments

feedback