PA SB1096 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on September 26 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-10-01 - Referred to TRANSPORTATION
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Titles 74 (Transportation) and 75 (Vehicles) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in Aviation Advisory Committee, further providing for Aviation Advisory Committee; in general provisions, further providing for definitions; in rules of the road in general, providing for platooning; and providing for highly automated vehicles.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In Aviation Advisory Committee, further providing for Aviation Advisory Committee; in general provisions, further providing for definitions; in rules of the road in general, providing for platooning; and providing for highly automated vehicles.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-09-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1096 PN 2029, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-24 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-10-01HouseReferred to TRANSPORTATION
2018-09-26HouseIn the House
2018-09-26SenateThird consideration and final passage (48-0)
2018-09-25SenateAmended on third consideration
2018-09-24SenateRe-reported as committed
2018-06-21SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2018-06-21SenateSecond consideration
2018-06-20SenateFirst consideration
2018-06-20SenateReported as amended
2018-03-28SenateReferred to TRANSPORTATION

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=S&type=B&bn=1096
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=1096&pn=1613
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=1096&pn=1897
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=1096&pn=2029
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=19&theDate=06/20/2018&RollCallId=1000
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=09/24/2018&RollCallId=1065
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=651

Bill Comments

feedback