PA SB1094 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-11 - Act No. 90 of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-11 - Act No. 90 of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 75 (Vehicles) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in registration of vehicles, providing for apportioned registration renewal; in commercial drivers, further providing for commercial driver's license; in miscellaneous provisions, repealing provisions relating to snow and ice dislodged or falling from moving vehicle and providing for snow and ice; and, in motor carrier safety, repealing provisions relating to findings and declaration of policy and further providing for definitions and for Motor Carrier Safety Advisory Committee.
Title
In registration of vehicles, providing for apportioned registration renewal; in commercial drivers, further providing for commercial driver's license; in miscellaneous provisions, repealing provisions relating to snow and ice dislodged or falling from moving vehicle and providing for snow and ice; and, in motor carrier safety, repealing provisions relating to findings and declaration of policy and further providing for definitions and for Motor Carrier Safety Advisory Committee.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-07-06 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-07-06 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1094 PN 1806, Concur in House Amendments (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - House - House Floor: SB 1094 PN 1806, FP (Y: 200 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-22 - House - House Transportation: Adopt Amendment A04857 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-22 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1094 PN 1728, 2021 A4699, Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1094 PN 1728, 2021 A4699, MUTH Amendment No. A-4699 (Y: 21 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2022-05-23 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-06 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Committed (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-07-06 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1094 PN 1806, Concur in House Amendments (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - House - House Floor: SB 1094 PN 1806, FP (Y: 200 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-22 - House - House Transportation: Adopt Amendment A04857 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-22 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1094 PN 1728, 2021 A4699, Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1094 PN 1728, 2021 A4699, MUTH Amendment No. A-4699 (Y: 21 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2022-05-23 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-06 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Committed (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-11 | Senate | Act No. 90 of 2022 |
2022-07-11 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2022-07-07 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2022-07-07 | Senate | Signed in House |
2022-07-06 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2022-07-06 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments (50-0) |
2022-07-06 | Senate | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2022-06-29 | Senate | Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS |
2022-06-29 | Senate | In the Senate |
2022-06-29 | House | Third consideration and final passage (200-0) |
2022-06-29 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2022-06-28 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2022-06-28 | House | Second consideration |
2022-06-27 | House | Removed from table |
2022-06-22 | House | Laid on the table |
2022-06-22 | House | First consideration |
2022-06-22 | House | Reported as amended |
2022-06-14 | House | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |
2022-06-13 | House | In the House |
2022-06-13 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2022-06-07 | Senate | Amended on third consideration |
2022-05-23 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Second consideration |
2022-04-06 | Senate | First consideration |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |