PA SB1090 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 17-7)
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-10-15 - Signed in Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Titles 18 (Crimes and Offenses) and 42 (Judiciary and Judicial Procedure) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in offenses involving danger to the person, providing for antihazing and prescribing penalties; in minors, further providing for purchase, consumption, possession or transportation of liquor or malt or brewed beverages and providing for safe harbor for violation of section 6308(a); in forfeiture of assets, further providing for asset forfeiture; and making a related repeal.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In offenses involving danger to the person, providing for antihazing and prescribing penalties; in minors, further providing for purchase, consumption, possession or transportation of liquor or malt or brewed beverages and providing for safe harbor for violation of section 6308(a); in forfeiture of assets, further providing for asset forfeiture; and making a related repeal.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-10-15 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-15 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1090 PN 1825, CONCUR IN HOUSE AMENDMENTS (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-09 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-09 - House - House Floor: SB 1090 PN 1825, FP (Y: 191 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A07316 (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1090 PN 1661, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-16 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Committed (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-10-15SenateSigned in Senate
2018-10-15SenateSenate concurred in House amendments (49-0)
2018-10-15SenateRe-reported on concurrence, as committed
2018-10-12SenateReferred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS
2018-10-09SenateIn the Senate
2018-10-09HouseThird consideration and final passage (191-0)
2018-10-09HouseRe-reported as committed
2018-10-01HouseRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2018-10-01HouseSecond consideration
2018-06-06HouseRemoved from table
2018-06-05HouseLaid on the table
2018-06-05HouseFirst consideration
2018-06-05HouseReported as amended
2018-04-19HouseReferred to JUDICIARY
2018-04-18HouseIn the House
2018-04-18SenateThird consideration and final passage (49-0)
2018-04-17SenateAmended on third consideration
2018-04-16SenateRe-reported as committed
2018-04-16SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2018-04-16SenateSecond consideration
2018-03-27SenateFirst consideration
2018-03-27SenateReported as committed
2018-03-23SenateReferred to JUDICIARY

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=S&type=B&bn=1090
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=1090&pn=1583
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=1090&pn=1661
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=1090&pn=1825
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=39&theDate=03/27/2018&RollCallId=736
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=04/16/2018&RollCallId=756
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=466
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=24&theDate=06/05/2018&RollCallId=1593
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=24&theDate=06/05/2018&RollCallId=1592
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1511
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=10/09/2018&RollCallId=2031
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=688
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=17&theDate=10/15/2018&RollCallId=1186

Bill Comments

feedback