PA SB108 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-10-12 - Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS
Pending: Senate Rules & Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-10-12 - Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS
Pending: Senate Rules & Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 20 (Decedents, Estates and Fiduciaries) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in anatomical gifts, further providing for manner of executing anatomical gifts and for Governor Robert P. Casey Memorial Organ and Tissue Donation Awareness Trust Fund contributions.
Title
In anatomical gifts, further providing for manner of executing anatomical gifts and for Governor Robert P. Casey Memorial Organ and Tissue Donation Awareness Trust Fund contributions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-10-10 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-10 - House - House Floor: SB 108 PN 1659, FP (Y: 193 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - House - House Floor: SB 108 PN 1529, 2017 A6317, PETRARCA (Y: 192 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A05794 (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 108 PN 82, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-10 - House - House Floor: SB 108 PN 1659, FP (Y: 193 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - House - House Floor: SB 108 PN 1529, 2017 A6317, PETRARCA (Y: 192 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A05794 (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 108 PN 82, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-10-12 | Senate | Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS |
2018-10-10 | Senate | In the Senate |
2018-10-10 | House | Third consideration and final passage (193-0) |
2018-10-10 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2018-04-17 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2018-04-17 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2018-03-14 | House | Removed from table |
2018-03-13 | House | Laid on the table |
2018-03-13 | House | First consideration |
2018-03-13 | House | Reported as amended |
2017-05-24 | House | Referred to JUDICIARY |
2017-05-22 | House | In the House |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Second consideration |
2017-03-28 | Senate | First consideration |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2017-01-13 | Senate | Referred to JUDICIARY |