PA SB1074 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on March 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-09-25 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-09-25 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of October 5, 1978 (P.L.1109, No.261), known as the Osteopathic Medical Practice Act, further providing for genetic counselor.
Title
Further providing for genetic counselor.
Sponsors
Sen. Thomas Killion [R] | Sen. Thomas McGarrigle [R] | Sen. John Rafferty [R] | Sen. Judy Schwank [D] |
Sen. Patrick Stefano [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-12 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection And Professional Licensure: Reported as Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-25 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2018-06-18 | Senate | Second consideration |
2018-06-12 | Senate | First consideration |
2018-06-12 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE |