PA SB1073 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on October 3 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-10-05 - Referred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY
Pending: House Labor And Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of June 28, 1935 (P.L.477, No.193), referred to as the Enforcement Officer Disability Benefits Law, further providing for disability benefits and for definitions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Further providing for disability benefits and for definitions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-10-03 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1073 PN 2067, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-25 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Senate - Senate Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Reported as Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-10-05HouseReferred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY
2018-10-03HouseIn the House
2018-10-03SenateThird consideration and final passage (48-0)
2018-10-02SenateAmended on third consideration
2018-09-25SenateRe-reported as committed
2018-04-23SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2018-04-23SenateSecond consideration
2018-04-17SenateFirst consideration
2018-04-17SenateReported as amended
2018-03-23SenateReferred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=S&type=B&bn=1073
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=1073&pn=1578
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=1073&pn=1656
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=1073&pn=2067
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=21&theDate=04/17/2018&RollCallId=767
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=09/25/2018&RollCallId=1102
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=676

Bill Comments

feedback