PA SB1072 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-30 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-30 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of November 24, 1998 (P.L.882, No.111), known as the Crime Victims Act, in preliminary provisions, further providing for definitions; in crime victims, further providing for rights, for responsibilities of victims of crime under basic bill of rights, for responsibilities of State and local law enforcement agencies and for responsibilities of prosecutor's office; in administration, further providing for office, for powers and duties of victim advocate and for powers and duties of Office of Victims' Services; in compensation, further providing for persons eligible for compensation, for filing of claims for compensation, for minimum allowable claim, for determination of claims, for emergency awards, for awards and for confidentiality of records; in services, further providing for eligibility of victims; in financial matters, further providing for costs and for costs for offender supervision programs; and, in enforcement, further providing for subrogation.
Title
In preliminary provisions, further providing for definitions; in crime victims, further providing for rights, for responsibilities of victims of crime under basic bill of rights, for responsibilities of State and local law enforcement agencies and for responsibilities of prosecutor's office; in administration, further providing for office, for powers and duties of victim advocate and for powers and duties of Office of Victims' Services; in compensation, further providing for persons eligible for compensation, for filing of claims for compensation, for minimum allowable claim, for determination of claims, for emergency awards, for awards and for confidentiality of records; in services, further providing for eligibility of victims; in financial matters, further providing for costs and for costs for offender supervision programs; and, in enforcement, further providing for subrogation.
Sponsors
Sen. Stewart Greenleaf [R] | Sen. Daylin Leach [D] | Sen. Vincent Hughes [D] | Sen. Judy Schwank [D] |
Sen. John Yudichak [R] | Sen. Patrick Browne [R] | Sen. Sharif Street [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1072 PN 1650, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-16 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-19 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-16 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-19 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-30 | House | Referred to JUDICIARY |
2018-04-25 | House | In the House |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Re-reported as amended |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Second consideration, with amendments |
2018-03-19 | Senate | First consideration |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Referred to JUDICIARY |