PA SB1068 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-20 - Act No. 23
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-20 - Act No. 23
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act authorizing the release of Project 70 restrictions on certain lands owned by the City of Lancaster, Lancaster County, in exchange for the imposition of Project 70 restrictions on other lands owned by the City of Lancaster, Lancaster County, and other consideration.
Title
Authorizing the release of Project 70 restrictions on certain lands owned by the City of Lancaster, Lancaster County, in exchange for the imposition of Project 70 restrictions on other lands owned by the City of Lancaster, Lancaster County, and other consideration.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-13 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-13 - House - House Floor: SB 1068 PN 1405, FP (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2016-04-05 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-06 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1068 PN 1405, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-17 - Senate - Senate State Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-17 - Senate - Senate State Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-13 - House - House Floor: SB 1068 PN 1405, FP (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2016-04-05 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-06 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1068 PN 1405, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-17 - Senate - Senate State Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-17 - Senate - Senate State Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-20 | House | Act No. 23 |
2016-04-20 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2016-04-13 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2016-04-13 | House | Signed in House |
2016-04-13 | House | Signed in Senate |
2016-04-13 | House | Third consideration and final passage (195-0) |
2016-04-13 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2016-04-12 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2016-04-12 | House | Second consideration |
2016-04-11 | House | Removed from table |
2016-04-05 | House | Laid on the table |
2016-04-05 | House | First consideration |
2016-04-05 | House | Reported as committed |
2015-12-08 | House | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |
2015-12-06 | House | In the House |
2015-12-06 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2015-12-05 | Senate | Second consideration |
2015-11-17 | Senate | First consideration |
2015-11-17 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2015-11-13 | Senate | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |