PA SB1066 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on September 26 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-10-01 - Referred to URBAN AFFAIRS
Pending: House Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act providing for the establishment of first-time home buyer savings accounts for first-time home buyers in this Commonwealth.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing for the establishment of first-time home buyer savings accounts for first-time home buyers in this Commonwealth.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-09-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1066 PN 2028, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-24 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Senate Urban Affairs And Housing: Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-10-01HouseReferred to URBAN AFFAIRS
2018-09-26HouseIn the House
2018-09-26SenateThird consideration and final passage (48-0)
2018-09-25SenateAmended on third consideration
2018-09-24SenateRe-reported as committed
2018-05-21SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2018-05-21SenateSecond consideration
2018-04-24SenateFirst consideration
2018-04-24SenateReported as amended
2018-03-16SenateReferred to URBAN AFFAIRS AND HOUSING

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=S&type=B&bn=1066
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=1066&pn=1545
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=1066&pn=1706
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=1066&pn=2028
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=35&theDate=04/24/2018&RollCallId=806
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=09/24/2018&RollCallId=1064
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=650

Bill Comments

feedback