PA SB1066 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 16-10)
Status: Engrossed on September 26 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-10-01 - Referred to URBAN AFFAIRS
Pending: House Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 26 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-10-01 - Referred to URBAN AFFAIRS
Pending: House Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act providing for the establishment of first-time home buyer savings accounts for first-time home buyers in this Commonwealth.
Title
Providing for the establishment of first-time home buyer savings accounts for first-time home buyers in this Commonwealth.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-09-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1066 PN 2028, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-24 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Senate Urban Affairs And Housing: Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-24 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Senate Urban Affairs And Housing: Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-10-01 | House | Referred to URBAN AFFAIRS |
2018-09-26 | House | In the House |
2018-09-26 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (48-0) |
2018-09-25 | Senate | Amended on third consideration |
2018-09-24 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2018-05-21 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2018-05-21 | Senate | Second consideration |
2018-04-24 | Senate | First consideration |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2018-03-16 | Senate | Referred to URBAN AFFAIRS AND HOUSING |