PA SB1058 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 28-0)
Status: Engrossed on September 17 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-09-24 - Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY
Pending: House Environmental Resources & Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 17 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-09-24 - Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY
Pending: House Environmental Resources & Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act providing for the abrogation of regulations relating to the CO2 Budget Trading Program.
Title
Providing for the abrogation of regulations relating to the CO2 Budget Trading Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-09-17 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 15 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-09-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1058 PN 1355, Final Passage (Y: 27 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - Senate - Senate Environmental Resources And Energy: Reported as Committed (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-09-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1058 PN 1355, Final Passage (Y: 27 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - Senate - Senate Environmental Resources And Energy: Reported as Committed (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-09-24 | House | Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY |
2024-09-17 | House | In the House |
2024-09-17 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (27-22) |
2024-09-17 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2024-09-17 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2024-07-08 | Senate | Removed from table |
2024-07-08 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2024-06-10 | Senate | Removed from table |
2024-06-10 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2024-04-29 | Senate | Removed from table |
2024-04-29 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Second consideration |
2024-02-05 | Senate | First consideration |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2024-02-02 | Senate | Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY |