PA SB1058 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 7 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-08 - Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT
Pending: House Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 7 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-08 - Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT
Pending: House Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of May 1, 1933 (P.L.103, No.69), known as The Second Class Township Code, in auditors and accountants, further providing for auditor's compensation.
Title
In auditors and accountants, further providing for auditor's compensation.
Sponsors
Sen. Joe Pittman [R] | Sen. Scott Hutchinson [R] | Sen. Patrick Stefano [R] | Sen. John Gordner [R] |
Sen. Michele Brooks [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1058 PN 1393, Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-04 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-04 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-08 | House | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2022-06-07 | House | In the House |
2022-06-07 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2022-05-23 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Second consideration |
2022-04-04 | Senate | First consideration |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |