PA SB1056 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 22-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-28 - Act No. 72
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 22-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-28 - Act No. 72
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 4, 1971 (P.L.6, No.2), known as the Tax Reform Code of 1971, in corporate net income tax, further defining taxable income.
Title
In corporate net income tax, further defining taxable income.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-22 - House - House Floor: SB 1056 PN 1657, FP (Y: 194 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-06-22 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - House - House Finance: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1056 PN 1657, FINAL PASSAGE-RECONSIDERED (Y: 42 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1056 PN 1657, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 44 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 16 N: 7 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Senate - Senate Finance: Reported as Amended (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-22 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - House - House Finance: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1056 PN 1657, FINAL PASSAGE-RECONSIDERED (Y: 42 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1056 PN 1657, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 44 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 16 N: 7 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Senate - Senate Finance: Reported as Amended (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-28 | House | Act No. 72 |
2018-06-28 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2018-06-22 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2018-06-22 | House | Signed in House |
2018-06-22 | House | Signed in Senate |
2018-06-22 | House | Third consideration and final passage (194-0) |
2018-06-22 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2018-06-21 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2018-06-21 | House | Second consideration |
2018-06-20 | House | Removed from table |
2018-06-19 | House | Laid on the table |
2018-06-19 | House | First consideration |
2018-06-19 | House | Reported as committed |
2018-06-14 | House | Referred to FINANCE |
2018-04-24 | House | In the House |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Final passage (42-7) |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Vote on final passage reconsidered |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (44-5) |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Second consideration |
2018-04-17 | Senate | First consideration |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Referred to FINANCE |